May 30, 2013 Re: North Toronto CI - Thank you and Welcome
Dear Students, Staff, Parents & Guardians of North Toronto Collegiate Institute, As you may know, Vice Principal Mary Laszlo retired effective March 31, 2013. Retired Vice Principal Sima Naymark (up until April 30) and presently, retired Principal Michael Ferguson have worked with the current administrative team to ensure the continuity of programming and service to our students until the end of the school year. Trustee Laskin and I have been working with Senior TDSB Administration to select a permanent Vice Principal commencing September 1, 2013. On behalf of the Toronto District School Board, we take this opportunity to inform you that on Wednesday, May 29, 2013 the board approved a series of Principal/Vice Principal transfers and promotions. At the meeting the placement of Mr. William Mack, who is returning from a secondment and a leave of absence, to Vice Principal-North Toronto CI, was approved effective September 1, 2013. At this time we would like to thank Mr. Ferguson for his ongoing excellent service and support of North Toronto students and his commitment to the North Toronto CI community since May 1. William Mack holds qualifications in Intermediate and Senior Divisions English and French with an additional qualification in French. Mr. Mack has extensive teaching experience at the intermediate and senior school levels and brings with him administrative experience as Vice Principal of Oakwood Collegiate Institute and Vice Principal of Northern Secondary School. He is returning from a secondment to OISE/University of Toronto and a leave of absence. Mr. Mack is committed to creating a caring, safe, inclusive and equitable school environment focused on student well-being, engagement, achievement and success. Please join us in welcoming William Mack to the North Toronto CI community. We look forward to working with Mr. Mack and the administrative team of Principal Joel Gorenkoff and Vice Principal Kathleen Pyper. Sincerely, Shelley Laskin, Trustee, Ward 11 Ian Allison, Superintendent of Education, WR08 Schools