Di awal tahun ini, Chris kanter mendapat kepercayaan dari Pemerintah untuk menjadi salah satu anggota Dewan Komisaris PT. INDOSAT, Tbk.
http://www.ameinfo.com/222515.html INDOSAT ANNOUNCES CHANGES TO THE BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS * Qatar: Thursday, January 28 - 2010 at 15:13 * PRESS RELEASE Changes also undertaken at the Companys Board of Directors Doha & Jakarta, January 28, 2010 An Extraordinary General Meeting (EGM) was held today during which shareholders approved changes to the composition of the Companys Board of Commissioners (BOC), changes to the composition of the Companys Board of Directors (BOD) and amendments to the Companys Articles of Association. The following individuals have been appointed to the BOC: Mr Chris Kanter, the Chairman and Founder of Sigma Sembada Group and Mr Alexander Rusli, a Commissioner of PT Krakatau Steel and the former expert staff to the Minister and Ministry of State-Owned Enterprises and expert staff to the Minister and Ministry of Communication and Information Technology. Leaving the BOC are Mr Michael Latimer and Mr Setyanto P. Santosa, who have stepped down in order to pursue different business interests. H.E. Sheikh Abdullah Bin Saud Al-Thani, President of the Board of Commissioners said: We express our sincerest gratitude to Mr Setyanto P Santosa, whose long and dedicated service as a Commissioner has been instrumental in the development of Indosats business. We are also very grateful to Mr Michael Latimer, whose service as a Commissioner helped navigate the Company through a complex transition period. We wish both of them every success in their future pursuits. The BOC welcomes Mr Chris Kanter and Mr Alexander Rusli, who both bring a wealth and breadth of experience and expertise to the role and whom we are confident will be central in developing the future growth of the Company. As a result of the EGM, Indosats latest Board of Commissioners is as follows: Board of Commissioners H.E. Sheikh Abdullah Bin Mohammed Bin Saud Al Thani as President Commissioner Dr Nasser Marafih as Commissioner Mr Richard Seney as Commissioner Mr Rachmat Gobel as Commissioner Mr Rionald Silaban as Commissioner Mr Jarman as Commissioner Mr Soeprapto as Independent Commissioner Mr George Thia Peng Heok as Independent Commissioner Mr Chris Kanter as Independent Commissioner (As of 28 January, 2010) Mr Alexander Rusli as Independent Commissioner (As of 28 January, 2010) In addition, one new member was appointed to the BOD, Mr Laszlo Barta, who joins Indosat from Grameenphone Ltd., Bangladesh (Telenor Group). Leaving the BOD effective 30 April 2010 is Dr Kaizad Bomi Heerjee whose latest role was Chief Commercial Officer & Director. Upon his departure from the BOD, Dr Heerjee will be taking on a new role at Qtel International. Sheikh Abdullah commented: We extend our utmost gratitude to Dr Kaizad Herjee for the contribution he has made to the commercial success of the Company over the last five years. We are pleased to welcome Mr Laszlo Barta, who brings a great depth of commercial experience from his tenure at Grameenphone. His strong track record in emerging markets will be of great benefit to the Board. As a result of this change announced and approved, Indosats new Board of Directors is as follows: Mr Harry Sasongko Tirtotjondro as President Director Mr Peter Kuncewicz as Director Mr Steve Hobbs as Director Mr Fadzri Sentosa as Director Mr Laszlo Barta as Director effective 1 May 2010 Shareholders at the EGM expressed their gratitude and appreciation to outgoing members of both Boards for their dedication and years of excellent service to Indosat. Indosat Tbk is a leading telecommunication and information service provider in Indonesia that provides cellular services fixed telecommunication services or fixed voice and fixed wireless service. The company also provides Multimedia, Internet & Data Communication Services (MIDI) through its subsidiary company, IndosatMega Media (IM2) and Lintasarta. Indosat is 65% owned by Qtel and as at 31 December 2009 had 33.1 million wireless customers. Ends About The Qtel Group Based in Qatar, The Qtel Group is a diversified telecommunications group with three business lines including consumer telephony, consumer broadband and corporate managed services, and is committed to expansion in line with the companys strategic vision of becoming a global top 20 telecommunications provider by the year 2020. Over the past three years, Qtel has expanded its geographic footprint from 2 to 17 countries within the Middle East and Asia, with more than 52 million customers. For more information, please visit: www.qtel.com.qa Forward-looking Statements Statements contained in this press release that are not historical facts may be forward-looking statements. To identify these forward-looking statements look for words like believes, expects, may, will, should, seeks, intends, plans, projects, estimates, or anticipates and similar words and phrases. These, and all forward-looking statements, are based on current expectations and necessarily are subject to risks and uncertainties which would cause actual results to differ materially from those currently anticipated due to a number of factors which include, but are not limited to, our ability to achieve our objectives and to maintain quality, resilience and service support. We caution readers not to rely on forward-looking statements, and we disclaim any intent or obligation to update these forward-looking statements. Press Contacts For Qtel Nick Swierzy +65 9248 0548 nswie...@qtel.com.qa International PR Diana Footitt +852 9183 0667 diana.foot...@fd.com Laurel Teo +65 8228 1061 laurel....@fd.com Indonesia PR Dian Safitri +62 811852004 dian.safi...@inkemaris.com Armand Maris +62 8128250440 armand.ma...@inkemaris.com APPENDIX I INDOSATS NEW BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS H.E. Sheikh Abdullah Bin Mohammed Bin Saud Al Thani (President Commissioner) Sheikh Abdullah is the Chairman of the Board of Directors for Qatar Telecom (Qtel). In his capacity as Chairman, he has enhanced Qtels corporate governance system to ensure the company is directed and controlled in line with international practices. Sheikh Abdullah has also overseen the restructuring and regional expansion of Qtel. After Qtels acquisition of Kuwait-based Wataniya, in what was considered at that time to be the largest telecom deal in the Arab World, Sheikh Abdullah was appointed Chairman of Wataniya. His Excellency was the Chief of the Royal Court (Amiri Diwan) from 2000 to 2005. He enjoys a ministers status and is also a member of the Qatari Planning Council. Sheikh Abdullah has an extensive background in both the Military and Aviation fields and is a certified Pilot (instructor) from the British Royal Air Force. Dr Nasser Marafih (Commissioner) Dr Nasser Marafih joined Qtel in 1992 and was appointed the Chief Executive Officer (CEO) in 2002. He has successfully guided Qtel through its transformation program and the restructuring of the company into business units and corporate centers. He played a key role in Qtels acquisition of Kuwait-based Wataniya in 2007. Dr. Marafih holds a Bachelor of Science in Electrical Engineering, a Master of Science and a PhD in Communication, all from George Washington University, USA. He has been a member of the Institute of Electrical and Electronics Engineers Inc. for over ten years. Mr Richard Seney (Commissioner) Mr Seney joined Qtel in May 2007 and is currently the Chief Operating Officer of Qtel International. He was previously President and Chief Executive Officer of U.S.-based MCT Corp. from 1992 through February 2007. MCT developed and operated 27 ventures providing mobile wireless telecommunications services in Central Asia and Russia. Mr. Seneys operating roles in the mobile industry began in 1985 with US-based Charisma Communications Corporation, where he served as Executive Vice President and Chief Financial Officer through the sale of Charismas operations in 1986 and 1987. He also served for many years as General Manager and VP of the General Partner of MCT Investors, L.P. (MCTI), which develops telecommunications and health care ventures. Mr. Seney also served in the emerging companies practice of Arthur Andersen & Co. (Washington, D.C. office) from 1976 to 1985. He graduated from the University of Virginia's McIntire School of Commerce in 1976. Mr Rachmat Gobel (Commissioner) Mr Rachmat Gobel is one of Indonesia's most respected businessmen. He heads PT Gobel Indonesia, which owns one of the largest consumer electronic product supplying businesses in Indonesia. His Gobel group is the Indonesian joint venture partner of Matsushita Electric Industrial Co Ltd, a global leader in electronics and electrical goods under the brand name Panasonic. Mr Gobel is also a Vice President of the Indonesian Chamber of Commerce and Industry (Kadin). He graduated with a degree in International Trade from Chuo University, Tokyo. Mr Soeprapto (Commissioner) Mr. Soeprapto has been an Independent Commissioner of Indosat since June 2005. He has served as the assistant personnel to the Army Chief of Staff (2000 to 2000) and was a Commissioner of PT Nusariau Kencana Coal (2001 to 2003). He has also been a Commissioner of PT Mentari Abdi Pertiwi since 2004. Mr. Soeprapto earned a degree in Political Science from the Open University, Jakarta and received training at the Indonesian National Defense Institute. Mr Rionald Silaban (Commissioner) Mr. Rionald Silaban joined Indosats Board of Commissioners in 2008. A graduate of the University of Indonesias Law Faculty, he earned his masters degree in Law (LLM) from Georgetown University Law Center, Washington DC. Prior to joining Indosat, he served in various senior positions in the Ministries of Finance and State-Owned-Enterprises, as well as a stint in Washing DC as a World Bank senior advisor. Mr Jarman (Commissioner) Mr Jarman joined Indosat as a Commissioner in 2008. He earned a degree in electronic engineering from the University of Indonesia, and later a Master of Science from Rensselaer Polytechnic Institute, USA. Mr Jarman started his career at the Ministry of State-Owned Enterprises before he was appointed a commissioner for PT Industri Sandang Nusantara (Persero). He was subsequently appointed President Commissioner of PT Tambang Batubara Bukit Asam Tbk. Mr George Thia Peng Heok (Commissioner) Mr Thia joined Indosat in 2008 as a Commissioner. He is a Certified Public Accountant and practised as an accountant with Coopers & Lybrand. He has more than 20 years experience in merchant banking and financial services, including time spent with Morgan Grenfell, Merrill Lynch, Sun Hung Kai Securities and Kay Hian Securities. Mr Chris Kanter (Commissioner) Mr Chris Kanter is a respected Indonesian businessman and business community leader. He is Chairman and Founder of Sigma Sembada Group, a major turn key contractor with transportation and logistics arms. He had been Vice President of the Indonesian Chamber of Commerce and Industry (KADIN Indonesia), continuously since 1994 and is committed to national economic development and reform. In addition to his commercial interests, Mr Kanter has also held a number of roles in the Indonesian Government and has been closely involved with The Policy Package for Improving Investment Climate in Indonesia. Mr Alexander Rusli (Commissioner) Mr Alexander Rusli is a commissioner of PT Krakatau Steel (Persero), the 100% state-owned company that produces carbon-steel products, providing half the total Indonesian market. He was formerly Expert Advisor to the Minister for State-Owned Enterprises, with oversight on 140 SOEs and more than 500 subsidiaries. Prior to this he was an Expert Advisor to the Minister of Communications and Information Technology, where he was involved in the formulation of policy, regulation and in overseeing the national state ICT infrastructure projects, a position he held under two cabinet ministers. Mr. Rusli has also acted as a Principal Consultant for Pricewaterhouse Coopers. He holds a Doctor of Philosophy, Information Systems, Curtin University of Technology. APPENDIX II INDOSATS NEW BOARD OF DIRECTORS Mr Harry Sasongko Tirtotjondro (President Director) Mr Sasongko joined Indosat in 2009 from GE Money Indonesia, where he has served as President Director and CEO since February 2005. In that role, he ran the GE Consumer Finance business in Indonesia, which includes a credit card business and a joint venture with Astra International, the largest auto finance company in Indonesia, Mr Sasongko started his finance career in 1987 with Panin Bank before moving to Citibank. He rose to become Director of PT Citicorp Finance, then left to join PT Bank Tiara Asia as Managing Director of Consumer Banking. He subsequently joined the Lippo Group where he served in various roles at Matahari Retail and Lippo Bank. He is a graduate of Bandung Institute of Technology Indonesia (ITB) in Civil Engineering and received a Master of Science degree from the Ohio State University, USA. He also holds qualifications as Chartered Financial Consultant (ChFC) and a Diploma in Financial Planning (Dip.FP) from the Singapore College of Insurance/American College, USA. Mr Peter Kuncewicz (Director) Mr Kuncewicz has over 30 years experience in finance across multiple international markets, 10 of them in the telecoms sector. From 2006 to date, he served as the Chief Financial Officer (CFO) of Telenor Pakistan, the No. 2 player in an active market of five players. As CFO, he oversaw procurement and ERP IT Systems, and was also responsible for the companys relationship with the Group, banks and other stakeholders to ensure appropriate support and funding. He also held board responsibilities at Telenor Pakistan. He was previously CFO of Star Foods SA (1998-2006) and Finance Director at United Biscuits Poland (1996-1997). Mr Kuncewicz is a member of the United Kingdom Chartered Institute of Management Accountants. He holds an MSc in Business Planning and Finance from the University of Salford, England, and a first degree in Biology from the University of Sussex, England. Mr Steve Hobbs (Director) Mr Hobbs has over three decades of international management experience in the telecommunications and technology industries across Europe and Asia. A pioneer in small antenna satellite systems and an expert in security programs in wireless environments, he holds patents in very-small cellular design and intelligent network routing. He has also authored numerous papers on cellular and wireless systems. He spent over 20 years with Cable & Wireless (C&W) in various positions, including Chief Engineer C&W Mobile, CTO Asia, CTO Global Mobile, and finally Vice President Mobile and ASP services (C&W Global) before leaving in 2001. Since then, he has been in independent consulting practice, supporting key clients such as Virgin Management (UK), C&W (UK), Wataniya Telecom (Kuwait) and Sapient (UK/US), supporting them in technology, development and strategy. Between 2003 and 2004, he also assumed the role of CTO for Asiacell in Iraq for the first nine months of operation, following its acquisition of a long tern national license. Mr Fadzri Santosa (Director) Mr Fadzri Santosa has been the Director of Jabotabek and Corporate Sales since June 2007. Previously, he has held several positions including Group Head National Card of Indosat from 2006 to 2007, Senior Vice President Commerce Jabotabek Region of Indosat from 2004 to 2006, and Senior Vice President Cellular Sales of Indosat from 2003 to 2004. Mr Sentosa earned a masters degree in International Business Management from the University of Technology, Sydney, in 2001 and a bachelors degree in Telecommunications Engineering from Bandung Institute of Technology in 1986. Mr Laszlo Barta ( Director) Mr Laszlo Barta has been the Deputy CMO and CRM Director at Grameenphone Ltd., Bangladesh, part of thre Telenor Group, where he has been instrumental in the development of their commercial business. He has held several positions at Garmeenphone over the course of the last five years including, Director of Marketing, Director of Sales and Head of SME Clients. Prior to which, he worked as Head of Corporate Clients at Panon GSM Ltd., in Hungary. He has also held positions at Ericcson Hungary Ltd and Philip Morris.